NY A06031 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Amistad commission; moves it from the department of state to the state education department.
Title
Relates to the Amistad commission; moves it from the department of state to the state education department.
Sponsors
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.196 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.196 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.196 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6031a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01924 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION