NY A06018 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sufficiency of itemization in the state budget; requires budget bills to clearly reference the section in the accompanying bill or bills where the corresponding appropriation or reappropriation can be located and requires that the legislature not act upon bills that neglect to do so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sufficiency of itemization in the state budget; requires budget bills to clearly reference the section in the accompanying bill or bills where the corresponding appropriation or reappropriation can be located and requires that the legislature not act upon bills that neglect to do so.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17Assemblyheld for consideration in ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-02-26Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07563 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback