NY A06009 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - substituted by s4854
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - substituted by s4854
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to develop recommendations regarding the establishment of microgrids.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to develop recommendations regarding the establishment of microgrids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4854 |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.180 |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S04854 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.78