NY A06009 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - advanced to third reading cal.627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - advanced to third reading cal.627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to forms of marihuana authorized for medical use.
Title
Relates to forms of marihuana authorized for medical use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.627 |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01087 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH