NY A05991 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.403
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.403
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the School Energy Efficiency Collaborative Act of 2016 to reduce redundancies, raise awareness, and promote the efficient implementation of energy projects in school districts across the state.
Title
Establishes the School Energy Efficiency Collaborative Act of 2016 to reduce redundancies, raise awareness, and promote the efficient implementation of energy projects in school districts across the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.403 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1984 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4386A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.773 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5991a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04386 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5991A