NY A05979 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes reproductive health conditions that affect female fertility as part of the health care and wellness education and outreach program.
Title
Includes reproductive health conditions that affect female fertility as part of the health care and wellness education and outreach program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Assembly | signed chap.248 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1705 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6957 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.444 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.444 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5979a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06957 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5979A