NY A05976 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - print number 5976a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - print number 5976a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the school energy efficiency program which shall construct a proposal to streamline the approval process for the installation of energy efficiency projects in public schools.
Title
Establishes the school energy efficiency program which shall construct a proposal to streamline the approval process for the installation of energy efficiency projects in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Assembly | print number 5976a |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04385 (Same As) 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4385A