NY A05975 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities' official functions.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities' official functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5975a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02418 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES