NY A05972 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s3770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s3770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority for the imposition of sales and compensating use tax in Schenectady county until November 30, 2013.
Title
Relates to extending the authority for the imposition of sales and compensating use tax in Schenectady county until November 30, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3770 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.523 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03770 (Same As) 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.239