NY A05971 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to operate and maintain all state parks and historic sites under its jurisdiction during the fiscal year that ends March 31, 2014 pursuant to the same seasons of operation, hours of operation, service levels, and public access to facilities as were implemented at the beginning of the fiscal year that ended March 31, 2010.
Title
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to operate and maintain all state parks and historic sites under its jurisdiction during the fiscal year that ends March 31, 2014 pursuant to the same seasons of operation, hours of operation, service levels, and public access to facilities as were implemented at the beginning of the fiscal year that ended March 31, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |