NY A05969 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts notices for certain payments in lieu of taxes in New York city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts notices for certain payments in lieu of taxes in New York city.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25Assemblysigned chap.565
2023-10-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1703
2023-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6999
2023-05-31SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2023-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.372
2023-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.372
2023-05-30Assemblyreported
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-03-24Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06999 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5969

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5969
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05969&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05969
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05969&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05969&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05969&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05969&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5969#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback