NY A05969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-20)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes references to STAR in the real property tax law and tax law; repeals provisions relating to the school tax relief credit.
Title
Removes references to STAR in the real property tax law and tax law; repeals provisions relating to the school tax relief credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5969a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.428 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.28 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.28 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04733 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 4733A