NY A05964 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - substituted by s4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - substituted by s4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of ice cream or other frozen desserts made with wine; removes the requirement that such products shall be in at least one pint packages.
Title
Relates to the sale of ice cream or other frozen desserts made with wine; removes the requirement that such products shall be in at least one pint packages.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
Asm. David DiPietro [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4265 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.228 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04265 (Same As) 2017-06-23 - SIGNED CHAP.40