NY A05938 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14Assemblyheld for consideration in judiciary
2020-02-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2020-01-17Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-21Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback