NY A05920 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Title
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04809 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - referred to transportation