NY A05920 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of restraints on children appearing before family court.
Title
Relates to the use of restraints on children appearing before family court.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.423 |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.148 |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04865 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES