NY A05920 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the authority of the state liquor authority to penalize licensees based on perceived violations of the laws of other states, unless the conduct in question amounts to an independent violation of the alcoholic beverage control law or has resulted in a criminal conviction in another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the authority of the state liquor authority to penalize licensees based on perceived violations of the laws of other states, unless the conduct in question amounts to an independent violation of the alcoholic beverage control law or has resulted in a criminal conviction in another state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-11Senatetabled
2015-12-11Senatevetoed memo.281
2015-11-30Assemblydelivered to governor
2015-06-16SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-16SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4446A
2015-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2015-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2015-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.240
2015-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.240
2015-06-10Assemblyreported
2015-06-02Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-05-26Assemblyprint number 5920a
2015-05-26Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2015-04-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2015-03-09Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S04446 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5920A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback