NY A05905 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to Senate apportionment; provides for sixty-two senators to be elected from each of sixty-two counties.
Title
Relates to Senate apportionment; provides for sixty-two senators to be elected from each of sixty-two counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-07-27 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 5905a |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |