NY A05883 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - print number 5883b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain personal protective clothing and equipment from the tax on sales and the compensating use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain personal protective clothing and equipment from the tax on sales and the compensating use tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24Assemblyprint number 5883b
2021-11-24Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-11-24Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 5883
2021-04-26Assemblyprint number 5883a
2021-04-26Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2021-03-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S00031 (Same As) 2021-11-10 - PRINT NUMBER 31B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback