NY A05874 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.
Title
Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.6 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.368 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.621 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5874a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3965A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1305 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3965a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.621 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.621 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 5874a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03965 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.6