NY A05874 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3965a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s3965a
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.621
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.621
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-12Assemblyprint number 5874a
2019-06-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S03965 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05874
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05874A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05874&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback