NY A05869 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the lease and landlord fraud public awareness program to promote public awareness of the potential risks of signing a fraudulent lease with an individual misrepresenting themselves as a landlord.
Title
Establishes the lease and landlord fraud public awareness program to promote public awareness of the potential risks of signing a fraudulent lease with an individual misrepresenting themselves as a landlord.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.193 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.332 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.332 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06135 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE