NY A05864 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants a retroactive parity payment to certain management and confidential retirees who retired between April 1, 2009 and March 31, 2015, not to exceed $5,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants a retroactive parity payment to certain management and confidential retirees who retired between April 1, 2009 and March 31, 2015, not to exceed $5,000.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2023-03-23Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06053 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback