NY A05863 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the mobile high-technology training facilities program.
Title
Creates the mobile high-technology training facilities program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | print number 5863a |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00158 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions