NY A05849 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - substituted by s5780a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing an additional mortgage recording tax in Chenango county; provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing an additional mortgage recording tax in Chenango county; provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblysubstituted by s5780a
2024-06-06Assemblyrules report cal.484
2024-06-06Assemblyreported
2024-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2023-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.634
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.634
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-03-28Assemblyprint number 5849a
2023-03-28Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-03-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05780 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5849
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05849
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05849A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05849&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback