NY A05847 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - print number 5847a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - print number 5847a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a crisis intervention demonstration program.
Title
Relates to establishing a crisis intervention demonstration program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | print number 5847a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S08677 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES