NY A05847 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.275 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.226 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | print number 5847a |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05041 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT