NY A05844 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s6329b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from De Bethesda Eglise for the 2020 and 2021 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from De Bethesda Eglise for the 2020 and 2021 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s6329b
2023-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.707
2023-06-08Assemblyreported
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-05Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-06-01Assemblyprint number 5844b
2023-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2023-05-10Assemblyprint number 5844a
2023-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2023-03-23Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06329 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.445

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05844&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05844&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05844A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05844&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05844B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05844&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05844&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback