NY A05842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; clarifies that it includes individuals employed by a school and individuals employed by a person or entity that contracts with a school to provide transportation services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; clarifies that it includes individuals employed by a school and individuals employed by a person or entity that contracts with a school to provide transportation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-25Senate3RD READING CAL.238
2019-03-25SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S273A
2019-03-14SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2019-03-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.120
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S00273 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5842

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05842&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05842&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05842
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05842&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05842&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05842&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5842#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback