NY A05839 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions relating to the lease or sale of real property for park purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions relating to the lease or sale of real property for park purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-04-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-09Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-09Assemblyhome rule request
2019-04-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.170
2019-04-02Assemblyreported
2019-04-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-22Assemblyprint number 5839a
2019-03-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to local governments
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05041 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05839
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05839A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05839&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback