NY A05838 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that at least one commissioner of the public service commission have experience in utility consumer advocacy.
Title
Requires that at least one commissioner of the public service commission have experience in utility consumer advocacy.
Sponsors
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted by s1199 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.261 |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | reference changed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S01199 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.594