NY A05817 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s3178a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s3178a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a posting of the rights of individuals who are applying to receive assistance including the right to: a fair hearing; ask about emergency assistance; apply for all benefits and services; ask about child care; free language services; screening and special services if experiencing domestic violence; and a written adequate notice.
Title
Requires a posting of the rights of individuals who are applying to receive assistance including the right to: a fair hearing; ask about emergency assistance; apply for all benefits and services; ask about child care; free language services; screening and special services if experiencing domestic violence; and a written adequate notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted by s3178a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.185 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 5817a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03178 (Same As) 2022-07-14 - SIGNED CHAP.377