NY A05795 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary commission to examine and review the degree and effect of segregation in primary and secondary schools and any correlation with school funding and the long-term impact of inadequate education on segregated students; expires 2021.
Title
Establishes a temporary commission to examine and review the degree and effect of segregation in primary and secondary schools and any correlation with school funding and the long-term impact of inadequate education on segregated students; expires 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | print number 5795a |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03794 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 3794A