NY A05783 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - substituted by s6150a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Henrietta, county of Monroe to alienate certain lands used as parkland to Forest Creek Equity Corp., and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Henrietta, county of Monroe to alienate certain lands used as parkland to Forest Creek Equity Corp., and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31Assemblysubstituted by s6150a
2023-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.366
2023-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.366
2023-05-30Assemblyreported
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-04Assemblyprint number 5783a
2023-05-04Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2023-03-23Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06150 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.441

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5783
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05783&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05783
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05783&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05783A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05783&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05783&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05783&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback