NY A05780 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain training for coroners and coroner's deputies.
Title
Requires certain training for coroners and coroner's deputies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.184 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.117 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S875B |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.479 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5780a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00875 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5780A