NY A05777 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.201
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03754 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback