NY A05773 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equal pay disclosure with respect to state contracts.
Title
Relates to equal pay disclosure with respect to state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.144 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1741 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2239 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.188 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.192 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.192 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02239 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5773