NY A05772 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an affirmation by any person, wherever made, subscribed and affirmed by that person to be true under the penalties of perjury, to be used in a civil action in New York in lieu of and with the same force and effect as an affidavit.
Title
Allows an affirmation by any person, wherever made, subscribed and affirmed by that person to be true under the penalties of perjury, to be used in a civil action in New York in lieu of and with the same force and effect as an affidavit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.559 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.504 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5162 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.176 |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05162 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5772