NY A05762 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the rare disease advisory council; advise and consult on policy matters relating to rare disease; twenty-one appointed members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the rare disease advisory council; advise and consult on policy matters relating to rare disease; twenty-one appointed members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.864
2019-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4497
2019-05-22SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.350
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-04-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04497 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5762

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05762&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05762&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05762
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05762&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05762&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05762&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5762#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback