NY A05761 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Blooming Grove to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Title
Authorizes the town of Blooming Grove to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1811 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.712 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.712 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01811 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.65