NY A05756 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - print number 5756d
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - print number 5756d
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all wine and liquor sold in the state be received from a primary American source of supply; such a source shall be the manufacturer or its exclusive agent, when the wine or liquor can be secured from the manufacturer or its exclusive agent by a wholesaler in the United States; provides that primary American sources of supply shall register with the state liquor authority.
Title
Requires that all wine and liquor sold in the state be received from a primary American source of supply; such a source shall be the manufacturer or its exclusive agent, when the wine or liquor can be secured from the manufacturer or its exclusive agent by a wholesaler in the United States; provides that primary American sources of supply shall register with the state liquor authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | print number 5756d |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | print number 5756c |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | print number 5756b |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | print number 5756a |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S03881 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3881C