NY A05740 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - substituted by s1567a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - substituted by s1567a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to publish the campaign website addresses of candidates for governor, lieutenant governor, attorney general, state comptroller, member of the state senate and member of the state assembly; directs such candidates to provide their campaign website addresses to the state board of elections.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to publish the campaign website addresses of candidates for governor, lieutenant governor, attorney general, state comptroller, member of the state senate and member of the state assembly; directs such candidates to provide their campaign website addresses to the state board of elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Pamela Harris [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] |
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s1567a |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5740a |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.226 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01567 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.307