NY A05713 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study of the delivery of ambulatory care and other medical care in this state in response to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study of the delivery of ambulatory care and other medical care in this state in response to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.103 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.736 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1784 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6375 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.330 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06375 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5713