NY A05704 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires manufactured home park owners to provide a written justification for rent increases in excess of three percent of the current rent; provides that increases in costs to justify such rent increase for ordinary maintenance or repair to meet the warranty of habitability obligations must be shown to be necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires manufactured home park owners to provide a written justification for rent increases in excess of three percent of the current rent; provides that increases in costs to justify such rent increase for ordinary maintenance or repair to meet the warranty of habitability obligations must be shown to be necessary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.161
2023-03-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.119
2023-03-28Assemblyreported
2023-03-22Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S05198 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback