NY A05691 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 5691e
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 5691e
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the exercise of powers and duties of the board of elections of the city of New York and its executive management.
Title
Relates to the exercise of powers and duties of the board of elections of the city of New York and its executive management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 5691e |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 5691d |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | print number 5691c |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | print number 5691b |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | print number 5691a |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06226 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - referred to election law