NY A05685 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing a tenant to deduct water payments he or she makes for a deficient landlord from his or her rent.
Title
Relates to allowing a tenant to deduct water payments he or she makes for a deficient landlord from his or her rent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.400 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.142 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 5685a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04846 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY