NY A05683 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6052b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6052b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers and duties of monitors in the East Ramapo central school district.
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of monitors in the East Ramapo central school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6052b |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.660 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 5683b |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | print number 5683a |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06052 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.173