NY A05661 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Title
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4378A |
2020-01-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-27 | Senate | recommitted to ways and means |
2020-01-27 | Senate | substitution reconsidered |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.218 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | substituted for a5661 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-01-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a5661 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5661a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s4378 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.218 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s4378 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.136 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04378 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means