NY A05625 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of financial services to establish an internet website for comparison of federal home equity conversion reverse mortgage products offered in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of financial services to establish an internet website for comparison of federal home equity conversion reverse mortgage products offered in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06Senatetabled
2019-12-06Senatevetoed memo.173
2019-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1380
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3221
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.134
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.134
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 5625a
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03221 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05625
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05625A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05625&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5625#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback