NY A05623 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s5013a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s5013a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides procedures relating to the adoption and submission of an annual budget by the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonality of the town of Southampton.
Title
Provides procedures relating to the adoption and submission of an annual budget by the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonality of the town of Southampton.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s5013a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.527 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | print number 5623a |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05013 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.438